US HR1454 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the recognition of the week of November 6 through November 13, 2022, as "Drowsy Driving Prevention Week".
Title
Expressing support for the recognition of the week of November 6 through November 13, 2022, as "Drowsy Driving Prevention Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2022-11-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2022-11-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR778 (Related) 2021-11-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1454/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1454/BILLS-117hres1454ih.pdf |