US HR14 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Committee on Rules, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Committee on Rules, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution authorizes the Speaker, on behalf of the House of Representatives, to intervene in the case of Texas v. United States, any appellate proceedings arising from such case, and any other cases involving the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. The Office of General Counsel of the House, at the direction of the Speaker, shall represent the House in such litigation. The office may employ outside counsel, including pro bono counsel, and other experts for this purpose. The amount expended by the office on outside counsel and other experts shall be printed quarterly in the Congressional Record.
Title
Authorizing the Speaker, on behalf of the House of Representatives, to intervene, otherwise appear, or take any other steps in the case of Texas v. United States, and in any appellate proceedings arising from such case, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Rules, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Rules, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR18 (Related) 2019-01-15 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HR6 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR16 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S146; text: CR S145-146)
HR6 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR16 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S146; text: CR S145-146)
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Congress
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Government information and archives
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
House of Representatives
Judicial review and appeals
Legislative rules and procedure
Congress
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Government information and archives
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
House of Representatives
Judicial review and appeals
Legislative rules and procedure
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/14/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres14/BILLS-116hres14ih.pdf |