US HR1359 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-17-1)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Demands that Hamas: (1) immediately and unconditionally release Israeli soldier Gilad Shalit; (2) allow prompt access to Gilad Shalit by competent medical personnel and representatives of the International Committee of the Red Cross; (3) provide Gilad Shalit the humane treatment all captives are entitled to as a fundamental human right; (4) facilitate regular communication by Gilad Shalit with his family and allow his family to know where he is being held; and (5) cease compelling Gilad Shalit to appear in video and voice recordings intended to extort and coerce the government of Israel. Expresses: (1) commitment to the survival of Israel as a Jewish and democratic state within recognized and secure borders; (2) support in resolving the Israeli-Palestinian conflict through the creation of a democratic, viable, and independent Palestinian state living in peace alongside Israel; (3) sympathy for Gilad Shalit's family and the families of other missing Israeli soldiers; and (4) commitment to seek the release of Gilad Shalit and other missing Israeli soldiers. Recalls: (1) the attack on and kidnapping of the bodies of Ehud Goldwasser and Eldad Regev by the Iran-supported terrorist group Hezbollah; and (2) the missing Israeli soldiers Zecharya Baumel, Zvi Feldman, Yehuda Katz, Ron Arad, Guy Hever, and Majdy Halabi. Condemns: (1) Hamas for the immoral cross border attack and kidnapping of Gilad Shalit; and (2) Iran and Syria, the primary state sponsors and patrons of Hamas, for their ongoing support for international terrorism.
Title
Calling for the immediate and unconditional release of Israeli soldier Gilad Shalit, who is held captive by Hamas, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-06-24 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-06-24 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 6/23/2010 H4713-4714) | |
2010-06-24 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4857) | |
2010-06-23 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Ackerman objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2010-06-23 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1359. | |
2010-06-23 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4713-4716) | |
2010-06-23 | Mr. Ackerman moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. | |
2010-05-13 | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SR571 (Related) 2010-06-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5497; text as passed Senate: CR S5497; text of measure as introduced: CR S5494)
Subjects
Arab-Israeli relations
Conflicts and wars
Gaza Strip
Human rights
Iran
Israel
Middle East
Military personnel and dependents
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Syria
Terrorism