US HR1358 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the week of September 17 through September 24, 2022, as "National Estuaries Week".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of September 17 through September 24, 2022, as "National Estuaries Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-09-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR655 (Related) 2021-09-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SR779 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4878; text: CR S4860)
SR779 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4878; text: CR S4860)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1358/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1358/BILLS-117hres1358ih.pdf |