US HR1355 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 135.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 135.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Of inquiry requesting the President and directing the Secretary of Health and Human Services to transmit, respectively, certain documents to the House of Representatives relating to ivermectin.
Title
Of inquiry requesting the President and directing the Secretary of Health and Human Services to transmit, respectively, certain documents to the House of Representatives relating to ivermectin.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 135. |
2022-09-29 | House | Reported adversely by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-529. |
2022-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported Adversely by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 21. |
2022-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-09-21 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2022-09-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-09-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-09-15 | House | Introduced in House |