US HR1336 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on September 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of September 2022 as "National Prostate Cancer Awareness Month".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of September 2022 as "National Prostate Cancer Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] |
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-09-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-09-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR378 (Related) 2021-09-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6630; text: CR S6628-6629)
SR776 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4877; text: CR S4877)
SR776 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4877; text: CR S4877)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1336/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1336/BILLS-117hres1336ih.pdf |