US HR131 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the designation of March 2015, as National Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month. Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month.
Title
Supporting the designation of March 2015, as National Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2015-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR114 (Related) 2015-03-25 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1895)
HR630 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR395 (Related) 2016-03-09 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1393; text as passed Senate: CR S1389)
HR630 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR395 (Related) 2016-03-09 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1393; text as passed Senate: CR S1389)
Subjects
Cancer
Commemorative events and holidays
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Commemorative events and holidays
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-resolution/131/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hres131/BILLS-114hres131ih.pdf |