US HR1287 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-30 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 144.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-30 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 144.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Of inquiry directing the President to provide certain documents in the President's possession to the House of Representatives relating to the recall of infant formula manufactured by Abbott Laboratories and potential impacts on the infant formula supply chain.
Title
Of inquiry directing the President to provide certain documents in the President's possession to the House of Representatives relating to the recall of infant formula manufactured by Abbott Laboratories and potential impacts on the infant formula supply chain.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 144. |
2022-09-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-538. |
2022-09-21 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2022-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 54 - 0. |
2022-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |