US HR1274 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 133.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 133.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Of inquiry directing the President to provide certain documents in the President's possession to the House of Representatives relating to communications by or among any of the Department of Health and Human Services, the Office of National Drug Control Policy, the White House, the Drug Enforcement Administration, and the Department of Justice related to the executive branch's recommendations for a long-term, consensus approach to reduce the supply and availability of illicitly manufactured fentanyl-related substances in the United States.
Title
Of inquiry directing the President to provide certain documents in the President's possession to the House of Representatives relating to communications by or among any of the Department of Health and Human Services, the Office of National Drug Control Policy, the White House, the Drug Enforcement Administration, and the Department of Justice related to the executive branch's recommendations for a long-term, consensus approach to reduce the supply and availability of illicitly manufactured fentanyl-related substances in the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 133. |
2022-09-29 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-527. |
2022-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported Without Recommendation by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 22. |
2022-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-09-21 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2022-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |