US HR1258 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 136.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 136.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Of inquiry directing the Secretary of Health and Human Services to provide certain documentation to the House of Representatives relating to the calculation of certain expenditure limitations applicable to Federal funding of the Medicaid program in Puerto Rico.
Title
Of inquiry directing the Secretary of Health and Human Services to provide certain documentation to the House of Representatives relating to the calculation of certain expenditure limitations applicable to Federal funding of the Medicaid program in Puerto Rico.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 136. |
2022-09-29 | House | Reported adversely by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-530. |
2022-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported Adversely by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 22. |
2022-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-27 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2022-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |