US HR1240 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 102.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 102.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the President, and directing the Secretary of State, to transmit to the House of Representatives copies of all documents in their possession referring or relating to certain aspects of the United States withdrawal from Afghanistan.
Title
Requesting the President, and directing the Secretary of State, to transmit to the House of Representatives copies of all documents in their possession referring or relating to certain aspects of the United States withdrawal from Afghanistan.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] |
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] |
Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 102. |
2022-09-20 | House | Reported adversely by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 117-480. |
2022-09-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported Adversely (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 23. |
2022-09-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2022-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR701 (Related) 2021-10-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.