US HR124 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 216-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing opposition to banning service in the Armed Forces by openly transgender individuals. This resolution (1) strongly opposes President Trump's ban on transgender members of the Armed Forces, (2) rejects the scientific and medical claims upon which it is based, and (3) strongly urges the Department of Defense to not reinstate the ban and to maintain an inclusive policy allowing qualified transgender Americans to enlist and serve in the Armed Forces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing opposition to banning service in the Armed Forces by openly transgender individuals.

Sponsors

Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]

Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 135 (Y: 238 N: 185 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-03-28HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 238 - 185, 1 Present (Roll no. 135). (text: CR H2891)
2019-03-28HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2019-03-28HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 124.
2019-03-28HouseThe resolution provides for one hour debate on H.R. 7 and H.Res. 124.
2019-03-28HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 252. (consideration: CR H2891-2899)
2019-03-27HouseRule H. Res. 252 passed House.
2019-03-25HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 252 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour debate on H.R. 7 and H.Res. 124.
2019-02-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2019-02-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR252 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback