US HR122 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 37) directing the removal of United States Armed Forces from hostilities in the Republic of Yemen that have not been authorized by Congress; waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules; and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 37) directing the removal of United States Armed Forces from hostilities in the Republic of Yemen that have not been authorized by Congress; waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules; and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 37) directing the removal of United States Armed Forces from hostilities in the Republic of Yemen that have not been authorized by Congress; waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules; and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 79 (Y: 228 N: 193 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 78 (Y: 227 N: 195 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-02-13HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 193 (Roll no. 79). (text: CR H1553)
2019-02-13HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 195 (Roll no. 78).
2019-02-13HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 122.
2019-02-13HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H1533-1542)
2019-02-11HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 7.
2019-02-11HouseThe resolution provides through February 17, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules.
2019-02-11HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-8, by Mr. McGovern.

Same As/Similar To

HJR37 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR122 (Similar To) 2019-02-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback