US HR121 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing that the United States needs a Marshall Plan for Moms in order to revitalize and restore mothers in the workforce.
Title
Recognizing that the United States needs a Marshall Plan for Moms in order to revitalize and restore mothers in the workforce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations. |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-11 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E123-124) |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR87 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S1030-1031)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/121/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres121/BILLS-117hres121ih.pdf |