US HR1152 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-10)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the goals of National Adoption Day and National Adoption Month by promoting national awareness of adoption and the children awaiting families, celebrating children and families involved in adoption, and encouraging the people of the United States to secure safety, permanency, and well-being for all children.
Title
Expressing support for the goals of National Adoption Day and National Adoption Month by promoting national awareness of adoption and the children awaiting families, celebrating children and families involved in adoption, and encouraging the people of the United States to secure safety, permanency, and well-being for all children.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. James Comer [R-KY] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] |
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] |
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2018-11-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR602 (Same As) 2017-11-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR331 (Same As) 2017-11-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7194; text: CR S7216-7217)
SR704 (Same As) 2018-11-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7099-7100; text: CR S7090)
SR331 (Same As) 2017-11-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7194; text: CR S7216-7217)
SR704 (Same As) 2018-11-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7099-7100; text: CR S7090)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/1152/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres1152/BILLS-115hres1152ih.pdf |