US HR1150 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the designation of May 2022 as "National Brain Tumor Awareness Month".
Title
Supporting the designation of May 2022 as "National Brain Tumor Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-05-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR451 (Related) 2021-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR266 (Related) 2021-06-09 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4021; text: CR S4020-4021)
SR648 (Related) 2022-05-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2669; text: CR S2667-2668)
SR266 (Related) 2021-06-09 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4021; text: CR S4020-4021)
SR648 (Related) 2022-05-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2669; text: CR S2667-2668)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1150/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1150/BILLS-117hres1150ih.pdf |