US HR1146 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of October 23, 2022, as a national day of remembrance of the tragic 1983 terrorist bombing of the United States Marine Corps barracks in Beirut, Lebanon.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of October 23, 2022, as a national day of remembrance of the tragic 1983 terrorist bombing of the United States Marine Corps barracks in Beirut, Lebanon.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2022-05-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-05-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR442 (Related) 2021-05-25 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1146/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1146/BILLS-117hres1146ih.pdf |