US HR1144 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing November 24, 2018, as "Small Business Saturday" and supporting efforts to increase awareness of the value of locally owned small businesses.
Title
Recognizing November 24, 2018, as "Small Business Saturday" and supporting efforts to increase awareness of the value of locally owned small businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2018-11-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR603 (Same As) 2017-11-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SR328 (Related) 2017-11-09 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7167; text: CR S7159)
SR692 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7062-7063; text: CR S7056)
SR328 (Related) 2017-11-09 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7167; text: CR S7159)
SR692 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7062-7063; text: CR S7056)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/1144/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres1144/BILLS-115hres1144ih.pdf |