US HR1134 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-9)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution celebrates the contributions of small businesses and entrepreneurs in every U.S. community and supports the designation of National Small Business Week. Further, it supports efforts to provide small businesses with aid and assistance through certain programs and initiatives.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of September 22, 2020, to September 24, 2020, as "National Small Business Week" to honor the entrepreneurial spirit and contributions of small businesses and entrepreneurs in the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK] |
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] |
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2020-09-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR347 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/1134/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres1134/BILLS-116hres1134ih.pdf |