US HR1105 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating March 21, 2024, as "National Women in Agriculture Day".
Title
Designating March 21, 2024, as "National Women in Agriculture Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Nikki Budzinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Lori Chavez-DeRemer [R-OR] | Rep. Jill Tokuda [D-HI] | Rep. Eric Sorensen [D-IL] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] |
Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Andrea Salinas [D-OR] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2024-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR120 (Related) 2023-03-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1081; text: 03/23/2023 CR S936)
SR604 (Related) 2024-03-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2478; text: CR S2475)
SR604 (Related) 2024-03-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2478; text: CR S2475)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/1105/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres1105/BILLS-118hres1105ih.pdf |