US HR1102 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the concurrence by the House in the Senate amendment to H.R. 2882, with an amendment.
Title
Further Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2024 Department of Education Appropriations Act, 2024 Department of Health and Human Services Appropriations Act, 2024 Department of Labor Appropriations Act, 2024 Department of State, Foreign Operations, and Related Programs Appropriations Act, 2024 Departments of Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree RC# 102 (Y: 286 N: 134 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 286 - 134 (Roll no. 102). (text: CR H1365-1479) |
2024-03-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1102. |
2024-03-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1367-1487) |
2024-03-22 | House | Ms. Granger moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2024-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2882 (Related) 2024-03-23 - S.Amdt.1790 Proposed amendment SA 1790 withdrawn in Senate.
HB143 (Related) 2023-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB4364 (Related) 2023-11-02 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 235.
HB4365 (Related) 2023-10-16 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 226.
HB4367 (Related) 2023-09-28 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 4367.
HB4664 (Related) 2023-11-09 - POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the Chair announced further proceedings on H.R. 4664 would be postponed.
HB4665 (Related) 2023-10-03 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 222.
HB5894 (Related) 2023-11-15 - POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the Chair announced further proceedings on H.R. 5894 would be postponed.
HB7684 (Related) 2024-03-15 - Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1311 (Related) 2023-04-27 - Held at the desk.
SB2302 (Related) 2023-07-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 130.
SB2309 (Related) 2023-07-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 131.
SB2438 (Related) 2023-07-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 144.
SB2587 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 181.
SB2624 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 187.
SB2625 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 188.
SB3222 (Related) 2024-01-26 - Became Public Law No: 118-36.
HB143 (Related) 2023-01-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB4364 (Related) 2023-11-02 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 235.
HB4365 (Related) 2023-10-16 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 226.
HB4367 (Related) 2023-09-28 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 4367.
HB4664 (Related) 2023-11-09 - POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the Chair announced further proceedings on H.R. 4664 would be postponed.
HB4665 (Related) 2023-10-03 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 222.
HB5894 (Related) 2023-11-15 - POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the Chair announced further proceedings on H.R. 5894 would be postponed.
HB7684 (Related) 2024-03-15 - Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1311 (Related) 2023-04-27 - Held at the desk.
SB2302 (Related) 2023-07-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 130.
SB2309 (Related) 2023-07-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 131.
SB2438 (Related) 2023-07-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 144.
SB2587 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 181.
SB2624 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 187.
SB2625 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 188.
SB3222 (Related) 2024-01-26 - Became Public Law No: 118-36.