US HR1093 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-8)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing support for the designation of September 2018 as "National Kinship Care Month". Expresses support for the designation of National Kinship Care Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing support for the designation of September 2018 as "National Kinship Care Month".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2018-09-27HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR531 (Same As) 2017-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SR264 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5866)
SR637 (Related) 2018-09-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/18/2018 S6234-6235)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback