US HR1091 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Calling on the Government of Burma to release Burmese journalists Wa Lone and Kyaw Soe Oo sentenced to seven years imprisonment after investigating attacks against civilians by Burma's military and security forces, and for other purposes. Condemns the attacks against civilians by Burma's military and security forces. Considers the actions by the Burmese military against the Rohingya in northern Rakhine State in 2017 to be genocide. Calls on State Counsellor Aung San Suu Kyi and President Win Myint to pardon Wa Lone and Kyaw Soe Oo and other journalists and political prisoners.
Title
Calling on the Government of Burma to release Burmese journalists Wa Lone and Kyaw Soe Oo sentenced to seven years imprisonment after investigating attacks against civilians by Burma's military and security forces, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended RC# 435 (Y: 394 N: 1 NV: 37 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 1 (Roll no. 435). |
2018-12-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10174-10175) |
2018-12-11 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1091. |
2018-12-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10061-10065; text: CR H10061-10062) |
2018-12-11 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2018-09-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2018-09-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR735 (Related) 2018-12-19 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7931-7932)
Subjects
Asia
Burma
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
News media and reporting
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Nations
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Burma
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
News media and reporting
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Nations
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity