US HR1089 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the week of May 1, 2022, through May 7, 2022, as "National Correctional Officers Week".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of May 1, 2022, through May 7, 2022, as "National Correctional Officers Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA] | Rep. Mary Miller [R-IL] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-05-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-05-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1089/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1089/BILLS-117hres1089ih.pdf |