US HR1067 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honoring the lives of fallen Missouri police officers and expressing condolences to their families.
Title
Honoring the lives of fallen Missouri police officers and expressing condolences to their families.
Sponsors
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR594 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 4/25/2022 CR S2133)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1067/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1067/BILLS-117hres1067ih.pdf |