US HR104 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of National Tribal Colleges and Universities Week.
Title
Expressing support for designation of the week beginning February 3, 2019, as "National Tribal Colleges and Universities Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] |
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR37 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S815; text: CR S811)
HR824 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR491 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 02/05/2020 CR S943-944)
HR824 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR491 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 02/05/2020 CR S943-944)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Minority education
Native Americans
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Minority education
Native Americans
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/104/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres104/BILLS-116hres104ih.pdf |