US HR1018 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on July 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 186.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 186.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the President to transmit to the House of Representatives certain documents in the possession of the President relating to the determination to impose certain tariffs and to the strategy of the United States with respect to China. Requests the President to transmit to the House of Representatives any documents that relate to: the determination of the President on March 8, 2018, to impose global tariffs of 25% on steel imports and 10% on aluminum imports; the strategy of the Administration with respect to negotiations with China to resolve U.S. concerns regarding China's policies that burden or restrict U.S. commerce; and any actions the Administration has considered taking to offset harm to U.S. exporters facing tariffs.
Title
Requesting the President to transmit to the House of Representatives certain documents in the possession of the President relating to the determination to impose certain tariffs and to the strategy of the United States with respect to China.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 186. |
2018-09-26 | House | Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-979. |
2018-09-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-09-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-07-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Asia
China
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Foreign trade and international finance
Metals
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Tariffs
Trade agreements and negotiations
China
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Foreign trade and international finance
Metals
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Tariffs
Trade agreements and negotiations