US HR1017 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 3617) to decriminalize and deschedule cannabis, to provide for reinvestment in certain persons adversely impacted by the War on Drugs, to provide for expungement of certain cannabis offenses, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 6833) to amend title XXVII of the Public Health Service Act, the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, and the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 to establish requirements with respect to cost-sharing for certain insulin products, and for other purposes; and for other purposes.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 3617) to decriminalize and deschedule cannabis, to provide for reinvestment in certain persons adversely impacted by the War on Drugs, to provide for expungement of certain cannabis offenses, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 6833) to amend title XXVII of the Public Health Service Act, the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, and the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 to establish requirements with respect to cost-sharing for certain insulin products, and for other purposes; and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - On ordering the previous question (Y: 219 N: 202 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 219 N: 202 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 219 N: 202 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-03-31 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 202 (Roll no. 99). (text: CR H4023) |
2022-03-31 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 202 (Roll no. 98). |
2022-03-31 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 1017. |
2022-03-31 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H4023-4033) |
2022-03-31 | House | The resolutions provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 3617, under a structured rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 6833, under a closed rule. The rule provides that House Resolution 188, agreed to March 8, 2021, is amended by striking April 1, 2022 each place it appears and inserting April 29, 2022. |
2022-03-31 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 71. |
2022-03-31 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-285, by Mr. Perlmutter. |
2022-03-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3617 (Related) 2022-04-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1017 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6833 (Related) 2022-09-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1017 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6833 (Related) 2022-09-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.