US HR100 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-24)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing the 100th anniversary of Easterseals, a leading advocate and service provider for children and adults with disabilities, veterans, older adults, caregivers, and their families. This resolution recognizes the organization Easterseals for its impact over the past 100 years and its commitment to helping children and adults with disabilities, veterans, seniors, and others to live, learn, work, and play in communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the 100th anniversary of Easterseals, a leading advocate and service provider for children and adults with disabilities, veterans, older adults, caregivers, and their families.

Sponsors

Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. John Rose [R-TN]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]
Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA]Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Steve King [R-IA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]
Rep. James Himes [D-CT]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-05HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E134)
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR85 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 2/28/2019 S1602)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback