US HJR90 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 83-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency relating to "Community Reinvestment Act Regulations". This joint resolution nullifies a rule published on June 5, 2020, by the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency within the Department of the Treasury. The rule generally revises the office's implementation of the Community Reinvestment Act (CRA), which requires banks to serve the credit needs of low- and moderate-income communities. Under the CRA, a bank receives credit, which influences the bank's performance rating, for conducting specified activities related to this requirement in designated assessment areas. Among other things, the rule revises qualifying CRA activities, sets forth new procedures for determining if an activity qualifies under the CRA, and expands designated assessment areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency relating to "Community Reinvestment Act Regulations".

Sponsors

Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]

Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - On passage RC# 129 (Y: 230 N: 179 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateReceived in the Senate.
2020-06-29HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-06-29HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 179 (Roll no. 129). (text: 06/26/2020 CR H2571)
2020-06-29HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2668-2669)
2020-06-26HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 90, the Chair put the question on passage of the joint resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Waters demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the joint resolution.
2020-06-26HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2020-06-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 90.
2020-06-26HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 1425, H.R. 5332, H.R. 7120, H.R. 7301 and H.J. Res. 90. The resolution provides that the provisions of section 125(c) of the Uruguay Round Agreements Act shall not apply during the remainder of the 116th Congress and the resolution amends H.Res. 967, agreed to on May 15, 2020.
2020-06-26HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1017. (consideration: CR H2571-2580; text: CR H2571)
2020-06-25HouseRule H. Res. 1017 passed House.
2020-06-24HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1017 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1425, H.R. 5332, H.R. 7120, H.R. 7301 and H.J. Res. 90. The resolution provides that the provisions of section 125(c) of the Uruguay Round Agreements Act shall not apply during the remainder of the 116th Congress and the resolution amends H.Res. 967, agreed to on May 15, 2020.
2020-06-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2020-06-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR1017 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback