US HJR80 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Approving the request of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs for a waiver under section 1703E(f) of title 38, United States Code. This joint resolution approves the request of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) for a waiver of specified statutory requirements for the purposes of implementing a pilot program as a part of the VA's Center for Innovation for Care and Payment. Specifically, the VA needs a waiver of certain dental care eligibility requirements in order to implement a pilot program focused on expanding veteran access to dental care services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approving the request of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs for a waiver under section 1703E(f) of title 38, United States Code.

Sponsors

Rep. David Roe [R-TN]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2020-01-13HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-01-13HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H185)
2020-01-13HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 80.
2020-01-13HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H185-186)
2020-01-13HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
2020-01-07HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 293.
2020-01-07HouseCommittee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
2019-12-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-12-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-12-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SJR61 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback