US HJR77 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-24)
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 246.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Opposing the decision to end certain United States efforts to prevent Turkish military operations against Syrian Kurdish forces in Northeast Syria. This resolution expresses Congress's opposition to the decision to end U.S. efforts to prevent Turkey's military operations against Kurdish forces in northeast Syria. It also calls on (1) Turkey to immediately cease unilateral military action in northeast Syria and respect existing agreements, (2) the United States to continue supporting Syrian Kurdish communities through military and humanitarian support and ensure that the Turkish military acts with restraint, and (3) the White House to present a clear and specific plan for the enduring defeat of the Islamic State of Iraq and Syria (ISIS).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opposing the decision to end certain United States efforts to prevent Turkish military operations against Syrian Kurdish forces in Northeast Syria.

Sponsors

Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]
Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]
Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO]Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]
Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC]

Roll Calls

2019-10-16 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution RC# 560 (Y: 354 N: 60 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-17SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 246.
2019-10-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
2019-10-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-10-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 354 - 60, 4 Present (Roll no. 560). (text: CR H8157-8158)
2019-10-16HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8164-8165)
2019-10-16HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-10-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 77.
2019-10-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8157-8163)
2019-10-16HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
2019-10-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-10-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR625 (Related) 2019-10-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SJR57 (Same As) 2019-10-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback