US HJR76 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 162-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Education relating to "Borrower Defense Institutional Accountability".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Education relating to "Borrower Defense Institutional Accountability".

Sponsors

Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. David Price [D-NC]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]
Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]

Roll Calls

2020-01-16 - House - On passage RC# 22 (Y: 231 N: 180 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateReceived in the Senate.
2020-01-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-01-16HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 180 (Roll no. 22). (text: CR H305)
2020-01-16HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2020-01-16HouseDEBATE - The House continued with debate on H.J. Res. 76.
2020-01-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 76.
2020-01-16HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 1230 and H.J. Res. 76 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order.
2020-01-16HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 790. (consideration: CR H305-315)
2020-01-14HouseRule H. Res. 790 passed House.
2020-01-13HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 790 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1230 and H.J. Res. 76 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order.
2019-09-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
2019-09-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SJR56 (Same As) 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5752)
HR790 (Related) 2020-01-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback