US HJR58 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Became Public Law No: 115-14. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Became Public Law No: 115-14. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Education relating to teacher preparation issues. This joint resolution nullifies the "Teacher Preparation Issues" rule finalized by the Department of Education on October 31, 2016. The rule implements requirements related to assessing the quality of teacher preparation programs under title II (Teacher Quality Enhancement) of the Higher Education Act of 1965.
Title
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Education relating to teacher preparation issues.
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] |
Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 83 (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - On passage RC# 85 (Y: 240 N: 181 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - On passage RC# 85 (Y: 240 N: 181 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-14. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 59 - 40. Record Vote Number: 83. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1651, S1663-1666) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S1625-1627) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (CR S1625) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2017-02-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-02-07 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 181 (Roll no. 85). (text: CR H1041) |
2017-02-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1056-1057) |
2017-02-07 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 58, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mrs. Davis(CA) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage until a time to be announced. |
2017-02-07 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2017-02-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 58. |
2017-02-07 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 44, H.J. Res. 57 and H.J. Res. 58. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each joint resolution. Each joint resolution is closed to amendments and allowed one motion to recommit. |
2017-02-07 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 91. (consideration: CR H1041-1046) |
2017-02-07 | House | Rule H. Res. 91 passed House. |
2017-02-06 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 91 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 44, H.J. Res. 57 and H.J. Res. 58. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each joint resolution. Each joint resolution is closed to amendments and allowed one motion to recommit. |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR91 (Related) 2017-02-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SJR26 (Same As) 2017-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SJR26 (Same As) 2017-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Education
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Higher education
Performance measurement
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional oversight
Department of Education
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Higher education
Performance measurement
Teaching, teachers, curricula