US HJR42 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 140-2)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional Amendment - States that the liberty of parents to direct the upbringing and education of their children is a fundamental right. States that neither the United States nor any state shall infringe upon this right without demonstrating that its governmental interest as applied to the person is of the highest order and not otherwise served. Provides that no treaty may be adopted nor shall any source of international law be employed to supersede, modify, interpret, or apply to the rights guaranteed by this amendment.
Title
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to parental rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR13 (Same As) 2009-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SJR16 (Related) 2009-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SJR16 (Related) 2009-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Elementary and secondary education
Families
Family relationships
International law and treaties
Elementary and secondary education
Families
Family relationships
International law and treaties
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-joint-resolution/42/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hjres42/BILLS-111hjres42ih.pdf |