US HJR30 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 120-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - The Chair directed the Clerk to notify the Senate of the action of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to "Prudence and Loyalty in Selecting Plan Investments and Exercising Shareholder Rights".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to "Prudence and Loyalty in Selecting Plan Investments and Exercising Shareholder Rights".

Sponsors

Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Brad Finstad [R-MN]Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ]
Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]
Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC]Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]
Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]Rep. John Rose [R-TN]
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC]Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS]Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]
Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC]Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX]Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN]
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX]Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH]Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT]Rep. Scott Fitzgerald [R-WI]
Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA]Rep. Elizabeth Van Duyne [R-TX]Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]
Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI]Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]
Rep. James Baird [R-IN]Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX]
Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL]Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA]Rep. Erin Houchin [R-IN]Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT]
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Mike Flood [R-NE]Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL]
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA]Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS]Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]
Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY]
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA]Rep. Mike Ezell [R-MS]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Mary Miller [R-IL]
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN]Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]
Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA]Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA]Rep. Robert Good [R-VA]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]
Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND]Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT]Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]
Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN]Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC]Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX]
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX]Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK]Rep. Brandon Williams [R-NY]
Rep. Aaron Bean [R-FL]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]Rep. Josh Brecheen [R-OK]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ]
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA]Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]
Rep. Max Miller [R-OH]Rep. Julia Letlow [R-LA]Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL]Rep. Lisa McClain [R-MI]
Rep. Wesley Hunt [R-TX]Rep. Michelle Steel [R-CA]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL]
Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX]Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT]Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA]Rep. Nathaniel Moran [R-TX]
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO]Rep. Richard McCormick [R-GA]
Rep. Kevin Kiley [R-CA]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Eric Burlison [R-MO]Rep. Derrick Van Orden [R-WI]
Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]
Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS]Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ]Rep. Russell Fry [R-SC]Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA]

Roll Calls

2023-03-23 - House - Passage, Objections of the President To The Contrary Notwithstanding RC# 149 (Y: 219 N: 200 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2023-03-01 - Senate - On the Joint Resolution H.J.Res. 30 RC# 35 (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - On Passage RC# 124 (Y: 216 N: 204 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23HouseThe Chair directed the Clerk to notify the Senate of the action of the House.
2023-03-23HouseThe previous question was ordered without objection.
2023-03-23HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to section 4 of H. Res. 199, the unfinished business is the further consideration of the veto message of the President on H.J. Res. 30. The House proceeded with one hour of debate on the objections of the President to the contrary notwithstanding. (consideration: CR H1383-1386)
2023-03-23HouseOn motion to refer the bill and the accompanying veto message to the Committee on Education and the Workforce. Agreed to without objection.
2023-03-23HouseMotion to refer the bill and accompanying veto message to the Committee on Education and the Workforce.
2023-03-23HouseOn passage, the objections of the President to the contrary notwithstanding Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 219 - 200 (Roll no. 149).
2023-03-23HouseFailed of passage in House over veto On passage, the objections of the President to the contrary notwithstanding Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 219 - 200 (Roll no. 149).
2023-03-23HouseThe Chair laid before the House the veto message from the President.
2023-03-21HousePOSTPONED CONSIDERATION OF VETO MESSAGE - The Chair announced that pursuant to section 4 of H. Res. 199, further consideration of the veto message and the joint resolution will be postponed until Thursday, March 23, 2023.
2023-03-21HouseThe Chair announced that the objections of the President to H.J. Res. 30 would be spread at large upon the Journal and the veto message would be printed as a House Document (118-18).
2023-03-21HouseThe Chair laid before the House the veto message from the President. (text: CR H1299-1300)
2023-03-20HouseVetoed by President.
2023-03-09HousePresented to President.
2023-03-02SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2023-03-01SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 46. Record Vote Number: 35.
2023-03-01SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S550-556)
2023-03-01SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2023-02-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2023-02-28HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 216 - 204 (Roll no. 124). (text: CR H932)
2023-02-28HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H941)
2023-02-28HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. J. Res. 30, the Chair put the question on passage of the resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Scott (VA) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage of the resolution until a time to be announced.
2023-02-28HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2023-02-28HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 30.
2023-02-28HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 347 and H.J. Res. 30. Provides for consideration of H.R. 347 and H.J. Res. 30 and one hour of debate on each measure. The rule makes in order amendments to H.R. 347 printed in the report and provides for one motion to recommit on each measure.
2023-02-28HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 166. (consideration: CR H932-940)
2023-02-28HouseRule H. Res. 166 passed House.
2023-02-27HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 166 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 347 and H.J. Res. 30. Provides for consideration of H.R. 347 and H.J. Res. 30 and one hour of debate on each measure. The rule makes in order amendments to H.R. 347 printed in the report and provides for one motion to recommit on each measure.
2023-02-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
2023-02-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SJR8 (Same As) 2023-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR166 (Related) 2023-02-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback