US HJR29 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the National Labor Relations Board relating to representation case procedures. Disapproves and nullifies the rule submitted by the National Labor Relations Board and published December 15, 2014, relating to representation case procedures.
Title
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the National Labor Relations Board relating to representation case procedures.
Sponsors
Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] |
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] |
Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] |
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] | Rep. David Jolly [R-FL] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Motion to Table S.J.Res. 8 (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2015-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SJR8 (Same As) 2015-05-05 - Motion to table the veto message to accompany S. J. Res. 8 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 96 - 3. Record Vote Number: 172. (consideration: CR S2644)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
National Labor Relations Board (NLRB)
Congressional oversight
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
National Labor Relations Board (NLRB)