US HJR22 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States. This joint resolution proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting total outlays for a fiscal year from exceeding total receipts for that fiscal year unless Congress authorizes the excess by a three-fifths roll call vote of each chamber. The prohibition excludes outlays for repayment of debt principal and receipts derived from borrowing. The amendment requires roll call votes of (1) three-fifths of each chamber of Congress to increase the public debt limit, and (2) a majority of each chamber for legislation increasing revenue. It also requires the President to submit a balanced budget to Congress annually. Congress is authorized to waive these requirements when a declaration of war is in effect or if the United States is engaged in a military conflict which causes an imminent and serious military threat to national security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HJR5 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR6 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR11 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR3 (Related) 2019-01-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SJR5 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR50 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HJR51 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SJR18 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR55 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback