US HJR123 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Became Public Law No: 115-90.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018 Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018 Short Titles - Senate Short Titles as Passed Senate for portions of this bill Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018 Official Titles Official Titles - House of Representatives Official Title as Introduced Making further continuing appropriations for fiscal year 2018, and for other purposes. DIVISION A--FURTHER CONTINUING APPROPRIATIONS ACT, 2018 Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018 This division amends the Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018 to extend the expiration date of the FY2018 Continuing Resolution (CR) from December 8, 2017, to December 22, 2017. The division provides continuing appropriations for federal agencies through the earlier of December 22, 2017, or the enactment of the applicable appropriations legislation. It prevents a government shutdown that would otherwise occur when the existing CR expires because none of the 12 FY2018 regular appropriations bills that fund the federal government have been enacted. DIVISION B--CHILDREN'S HEALTH INSURANCE PROGRAM (CHIP) ALLOCATION REDISTRIBUTION SPECIAL RULE This division amends title XXI (Children's Health Insurance Program [CHIP]) of the Social Security Act to establish a special rule, with respect to the first quarter of FY2018, for the redistribution of unused CHIP allotments to state child health plans experiencing emergency shortfalls. Specifically, the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) must redistribute unused allotments to each such state in an amount equal to the state's emergency shortfall before the CMS may redistribute the allotments to any state that is experiencing a nonemergency shortfall.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018 Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018 Short Titles - Senate Short Titles as Passed Senate for portions of this bill Further Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018 Official Titles Official Titles - House of Representatives Official Title as Introduced Making further continuing appropriations for fiscal year 2018, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-07 - Senate - On the Joint Resolution H.J.Res. 123 (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - House - On Passage (Y: 235 N: 193 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-08SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-90.
2017-12-08SenateSigned by President.
2017-12-08SenatePresented to President.
2017-12-07SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-12-07SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 81 - 14. Record Vote Number: 311. (consideration: CR S7923-7925)
2017-12-07HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-12-07HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 235 - 193 (Roll no. 670). (text: CR H9732)
2017-12-07HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9743)
2017-12-07HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 123, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill, and announced by voice vote that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Frelinghuysen demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until later in the legislative day.
2017-12-07HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2017-12-07HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 123.
2017-12-07HouseProvides for consideration of H.R. 477 and H.R. 3971 under structured rules with one hour of debate, one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each measure. Also provides for consideration of H.J.Res. 123 under a closed rule, with one hour of debate and one motion
2017-12-07HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 647. (consideration: CR H9732-9739)
2017-12-07HouseRule H. Res. 647 passed House.
2017-12-06HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 647 Reported to House. Provides for consideration of H.R. 477 and H.R. 3971 under structured rules with one hour of debate, one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each measure. Also provides for consideration of H.J.Res. 123 under a closed rule, with one hour of debate and one motion
2017-12-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
2017-12-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4515 (Related) 2017-12-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HR647 (Related) 2017-12-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2183 (Related) 2017-12-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback