US HCR5 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

This concurrent resolution states that President Donald J. Trump has acted in a manner grossly incompatible with self-governance and the rule of law. The resolution censures and condemns President Trump for trying to unlawfully overturn the 2020 presidential election and violating his oath of office on January 6, 2021. It affirms that Joseph R. Biden, Jr. was duly elected as the 46th President on November 3, 2020; was certified as the winner of the election by a Joint Session of Congress on January 6, 2021; and will be lawfully sworn into office on January 20, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Censuring and condemning President Donald J. Trump for trying to unlawfully overturn the 2020 Presidential election and violating his oath of office on January 6, 2021.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback