US HCR275 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 96-6)
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-23 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-23 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the designation of the week beginning on the second Sunday of September as Arts in Education Week.
Title
Expressing support for designation of the week beginning on the second Sunday of September as Arts in Education Week.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-23 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-12-22 | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-12-22 | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11053) | |
2010-07-27 | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. | |
2010-07-26 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-07-26 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6011-6012) | |
2010-07-26 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 275. | |
2010-07-26 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6011-6013) | |
2010-07-26 | Mr. Polis (CO) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities. | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
Subjects
Art, artists, authorship
Commemorative events and holidays
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Literacy and language arts
Music
Performing arts
Commemorative events and holidays
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Literacy and language arts
Music
Performing arts