US HCR103 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on August 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of Congress that August 30, 2021, be observed as the 131st anniversary of the 1890 Institutions.
Title
Expressing the sense of Congress that August 30, 2021, be observed as the 131st anniversary of the 1890 Institutions.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2022-08-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2022-08-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR48 (Same As) 2021-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/103/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hconres103/BILLS-117hconres103ih.pdf |