US HB984 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - Became Public Law No: 115-121. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Thomasina E. Jordan Indian Tribes of Virginia Federal Recognition Act of 2017 TITLE I--CHICKAHOMINY INDIAN TRIBE (Sec. 103) This bill extends federal recognition to the Chickahominy Tribe. The tribe and its members are made eligible for the services and benefits provided by the federal government to federally recognized Indian tribes, without regard to the existence of a reservation for the tribe. The bill establishes the service area of the tribe. (Sec. 104) The bill sets forth requirements for the tribe regarding its membership roll, governing documents, and governing body. (Sec. 106) The Department of the Interior, upon the request of the tribe, must take certain land owned by the tribe in Virginia into trust for the benefit of the tribe, to be considered part of the tribe's reservation. The bill prohibits the tribe from conducting gaming activities. (Sec. 107) The bill does not affect the hunting, fishing, trapping, gathering, or water rights of the tribe or its members. TITLE II--CHICKAHOMINY INDIAN TRIBE--EASTERN DIVISION (Sec. 203) This bill extends federal recognition to the Chickahominy Indian Tribe--Eastern Division. The tribe and its members are made eligible for the services and benefits provided by the federal government to federally recognized tribes, without regard to the existence of a reservation for the tribe. The bill establishes the service area of the tribe. (Sec. 204) The bill sets forth requirements for the tribe regarding its membership roll, governing documents, and governing body. (Sec. 206) The Department of the Interior, upon the request of the tribe, must take certain land owned by the tribe in Virginia into trust for the benefit of the tribe, to be considered part of the tribe's reservation. The bill prohibits the tribe from conducting gaming activities. (Sec. 207) The bill does not affect the hunting, fishing, trapping, gathering, or water rights of the tribe or its members. TITLE III--UPPER MATTAPONI TRIBE (Sec. 303) This bill extends federal recognition to the Upper Mattaponi Tribe. The tribe and its members are made eligible for the services and benefits provided by the federal government to federally recognized tribes, without regard to the existence of a reservation for the tribe. The bill establishes the service area of the tribe. (Sec. 304) The bill sets forth requirements for the tribe regarding its membership roll, governing documents, and governing body. (Sec. 306) The Department of the Interior, upon the request of the tribe, must take certain land owned by the tribe in Virginia into trust for the benefit of the tribe, to be considered part of the tribe's reservation. The bill prohibits the tribe from conducting gaming activities. (Sec. 307) The bill does not affect the hunting, fishing, trapping, gathering, or water rights of the tribe or its members. TITLE IV--RAPPAHANNOCK TRIBE, INC. (Sec. 403) This bill extends federal recognition to the Rappahannock Tribe, Inc. The tribe and its members are made eligible for the services and benefits provided by the federal government to federally recognized tribes, without regard to the existence of a reservation for the tribe. The bill establishes the service area of the tribe. (Sec. 404) The bill sets forth requirements for the tribe regarding its membership roll, governing documents, and governing body. (Sec. 406) The Department of the Interior, upon the request of the tribe, must take certain land owned by the tribe in Virginia into trust for the benefit of the tribe, to be considered part of the tribe's reservation. The bill prohibits the tribe from conducting gaming activities. (Sec. 407) The bill does not affect the hunting, fishing, trapping, gathering, or water rights of the tribe or its members. TITLE V--MONACAN INDIAN NATION (Sec. 503) This bill extends federal recognition to the Monacan Indian Nation. The tribe and its members are made eligible for the services and benefits provided by the federal government to federally recognized tribes, without regard to the existence of a reservation for the tribe. The bill establishes the service area of the tribe. (Sec. 504) The bill sets forth requirements for the tribe regarding its membership roll, governing documents, and governing body. (Sec. 506) The Department of the Interior, upon the request of the tribe, must take certain land owned by the tribe in Virginia into trust for the benefit of the tribe, to be considered part of the tribe's reservation. The bill prohibits the tribe from conducting gaming activities. (Sec. 507) The bill does not affect the hunting, fishing, trapping, gathering, or water rights of the tribe or its members. TITLE VI--NANSEMOND INDIAN TRIBE (Sec. 603) This bill extends federal recognition to the Nansemond Indian Tribe. The tribe and its members are made eligible for the services and benefits provided by the federal government to federally recognized tribes, without regard to the existence of a reservation for the tribe. The bill establishes the service area of the tribe. (Sec. 604) The bill sets forth requirements for the tribe regarding its membership roll, governing documents, and governing body. (Sec. 606) The Department of the Interior, upon the request of the tribe, must take certain land owned by the tribe in Virginia into trust for the benefit of the tribe, to be considered part of the tribe's reservation. The bill prohibits the tribe from conducting gaming activities. (Sec. 607) The bill does not affect the hunting, fishing, trapping, gathering, or water rights of the tribe or its members. TITLE VII--EMINENT DOMAIN (Sec. 701) Eminent domain may not be used to acquire lands for a tribe recognized under this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Thomasina E. Jordan Indian Tribes of Virginia Federal Recognition Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-29SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-121. (TXT | PDF)
2018-01-29SenateSigned by President.
2018-01-17SenatePresented to President.
2018-01-12SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-01-11SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
2018-01-11SenateSenate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S153)
2017-09-13SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2017-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
2017-05-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-05-17HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4251-4257)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4266)
2017-05-17HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-05-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 984.
2017-05-17HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4251-4259)
2017-05-17HouseMr. Wittman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-02-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-02-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB691 (Same As) 2017-06-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 161.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback