US HB980 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-09 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-09 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To withdraw certain land located in Curry County and Josephine County, Oregon, from all forms of entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws, location, entry, and patent under the mining laws, and operation under the mineral leasing and geothermal leasing laws, and for other purposes.
Title
Southwestern Oregon Watershed and Salmon Protection Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB803 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/980/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr980/BILLS-117hr980ih.pdf |