US HB98 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the establishment of a COVID-19 Compensation Fund to compensate claimants for harms resulting from suffering from COVID-19, and for other purposes.
Title
COVID–19 Victims Compensation Fund Act
Sponsors
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB476 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1357 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1357 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/98/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr98/BILLS-117hr98ih.pdf |