US HB965 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 161.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides statutory authority for the Young African Leaders Initiative (YALI), which seeks to build the capacity of young African leaders in sub-Saharan Africa in the areas of business, civic engagement, or public administration. The YALI program must support the participation of fellows from Africa in the Mandela Washington Fellowships for Young African Leaders and offer training through regional leadership centers in sub-Saharan Africa to individuals who have demonstrated strong capabilities in entrepreneurship, innovation, public service and leadership, and peace building and conflict resolution. The Department of State must oversee all U.S.-based activities carried out under the program, and the United States should continue to support program initiatives in sub-Saharan Africa. The State Department must also submit a plan for implementing the program and annual reports on program progress and recommendations for improvements or changes to the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

YALI Act of 2021 Young African Leaders Initiative Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-28SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 161.
2021-10-28SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2021-10-19SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2021-04-22SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2021-04-20HousePursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 330, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 367; H.R. 370; H.R. 396; H.R. 397, as amended; H.R. 408; H.R. 490; H.R. 965, as amended; H.R. 1251, as amended; H.R. 1395; H.R. 1491; H.R. 1528; H.R. 1532; H.R. 1565; H.R. 1602; and H.R. 2523, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 124, as amended. (consideration: CR H1979-1994; text: CR H1984)
2021-04-20HousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 330, proceedings on H.R. 965 are considered vacated.
2021-04-19HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-04-19HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 965.
2021-04-19HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1937-1939; text: CR H1937-1938)
2021-04-19HouseMr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-02-25HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-02-25HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-02-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2021-02-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR330 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback