US HB958 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends tribal jurisdiction over the following crimes: violence committed against a child by a caregiver; violence against law enforcement officers involved in preventing, investigating, arresting, or prosecuting a person for domestic violence, dating violence, or child violence; attempted dating violence or domestic violence; or threatened dating violence or domestic violence. In addition, the bill reauthorizes grants to tribal governments for exercising tribal criminal jurisdiction for those crimes through FY2022.
Title
Native Youth and Tribal Officer Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB290 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Child safety and welfare
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Domestic violence and child abuse
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement officers
Native Americans
Violent crime
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Domestic violence and child abuse
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement officers
Native Americans
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/958/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr958/BILLS-116hr958ih.pdf |