US HB954 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-116. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To remove the use restrictions on certain land transferred to Rockingham County, Virginia, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill declares that the approximately one-acre portion of specified land transferred by the United States to Rockingham County, Virginia, that is used for purposes of a child care center, shall not be subject to the use restriction imposed in the deed for the transferred land. The bill eliminates the requirement that the county include information concerning the use of the transferred land for a child care center in biennial reports to the Department of the Interior.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To remove the use restrictions on certain land transferred to Rockingham County, Virginia, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-12SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-116. (TXT | PDF)
2018-01-12SenateSigned by President.
2018-01-02SenatePresented to President.
2017-12-22SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-12-21SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8267-8269)
2017-07-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 170.
2017-07-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-07-11HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5403)
2017-07-11HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 954.
2017-07-11HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5403-5404)
2017-07-11HouseMr. LaHood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-07-11HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 140.
2017-07-11HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-203.
2017-06-27HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2017-06-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-02-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-02-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-02-07HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E158)
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB331 (Same As) 2017-05-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 53.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback