US HB940 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a categorical exclusion for electric utility rights-of-way, and for other purposes.
Title
Clearing Lines along Electrical At-Risk Zones Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Yvette Herrell [R-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4302 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/940/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr940/BILLS-117hr940ih.pdf |