US HB935 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 87-23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Miners Pension Protection Act This bill transfers certain funds to provide pension benefits for retired coal miners who have been affected by issues such as coal company bankruptcies. The Department of the Treasury must transfer additional funds to the 1974 United Mine Workers of America (UMWA) Pension Plan to pay pension benefits required under that plan if the annual limit on transfers under the Surface Mining Control and Reclamation Act of 1977 exceeds the amount required to be transferred for existing obligations of the Abandoned Mine Reclamation Fund. The bill also increases the annual limit on transfers from $490 million to $750 million. The bill also allows in-service distributions under a pension plan or governmental section 457(b) plan at age 59-1/2 (currently age 62).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Miners Pension Protection Act

Sponsors

Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]
Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. James Comer [R-KY]
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]
Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-10-23HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-23HouseSubcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
2019-07-24HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2019-01-31HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-31HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB27 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB671 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2788 (Related) 2019-11-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback